Accounts and annual returns GREAT MISSENDEN C OF E COMBINED SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1061594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 28 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 April 2025 302 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 April 2025 668 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 September 2022 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required