CATHERINE ANNE, COUNTESS OF BRIDGEWATER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 24 May 1963: Standard registration
- 23 December 2004: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
- THE BRIDGEWATER TRUST (Working name)
- COUNTESS OF BRIDGEWATER'S FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £295 | |
|
Total expenditure | £325 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 15 September 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME MADE BY BOARD OF EDUCATION ON 1/12/1904 AS VARIED BY SCHEME MADE BY SAID BOARD ON 30/8/1921 & SCHEME OF CHARITY COMMISSIONERS OF 4/9/1989 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 18/4/1991, AS AMENDED ON 20/09/2004 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER S75 OF CA 1993
Charitable objects
(A)THE SUPPORT OF ELEMENTARY SCHOOLS.(B)THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.(C)ASSISTING PUPILS TO ATTEND SCHOOLS,INSTITUTIONS OR CLASSES FOR THE PURPOSE OF EDUCATION OTHER THAN ELEMENTARY.(D)AWARDING PRIZES.(E)PROVIDING BOOKS OR FITTINGS FOR A SCHOOL LIBRARY.
Area of benefit
BEDFORDSHIRE,BUCKINGHAMSHIRE,HERTFORDSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window