Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE MAGNA CARTA SCHOOL

Charity number: 1061841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.94k £4.29k £4.82k £4.96k £1.65k
Total expenditure £1.22k £3.65k £6.50k £4.16k £971
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A