ROE'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity Number: 307485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

From our income received from rental of agriculture land we apply this to grants to students for further education - universities etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £11,748
Total expenditure: £6,300

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 June 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS JANE HYDE Chair 24 May 2016
ROE'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF WILLIAM FIELD
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, STOTFOLD
Received: On time
ROE'S CHARITY FOR THE PARISH CLERK
Received: On time
H. O. ROE CHARITY
Received: On time
Patrick Joseph Partington Harris Trustee 24 June 2024
ROE'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF WILLIAM FIELD
Received: On time
ROE'S CHARITY FOR THE PARISH CLERK
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, STOTFOLD
Received: On time
STEPHEN WILLIAM HAYES Trustee 11 October 2022
THE ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF WILLIAM FIELD
Received: On time
H. O. ROE CHARITY
Received: On time
Jean Billson Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
Jennifer Bennett Trustee 15 May 2022
ROE'S CHARITY FOR THE PARISH CLERK
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, STOTFOLD
Received: On time
THE ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF WILLIAM FIELD
Received: On time
H. O. ROE CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Bill Britt Trustee 19 January 2015
THE ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF WILLIAM FIELD
Received: On time
ROE'S CHARITY FOR THE PARISH CLERK
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, STOTFOLD
Received: On time
ROE'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
H. O. ROE CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.85k £4.88k £873 £8.57k £11.75k
Total expenditure £4.65k £4.65k £2.65k £7.02k £6.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 25 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 PIX ROAD
STOTFOLD
HITCHIN
SG5 4HY
Phone:
01462730103
Website:

No information available