TENTERDEN CHURCH SCHOOLS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide benefits to schools, including C of E Sunday Schools, and to promote the education of persons under the age of 25 years who or whose parents live (effectively) in Tenterden, St. Michaels or Smallhythe, or such persons who have been to school there, and are in need of financial assistance.Currently activities are restricted to providing bibles to junior school leavers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 17 February 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH NAOMI HARPER | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||||
Rev LINDSAY JOHN HAMMOND | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|||||||||||||
SHIRLEY REEDMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||
THE REVEREND JOHN CHARLES LIONEL EMMOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £361 | £519 | £3.49k | £3.73k | £3.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £671 | £662 | £700 | £4.79k | £1.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS OF THE 12TH AUGUST 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR ANY SCHOOL IN OR SUBSTANTIALLY SERVING THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE TRUSTEES AND THE GOVERNORS OF THE SCHOOL CONCERNED AFTER CONSULTATION WITH THE SAID AUTHORITY (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 24 OF THE SCHEME)
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF TENTERDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
65 Rogersmead
Tenterden
TN30 6LF
- Phone:
- 01580765540
- Email:
- robert.abel@ymail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window