THE CHARLES MILNER FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 18 July 1963: Standard registration
- 28 February 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- MILNER CHARITY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 13 October 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 8TH FEBRUARY 1898 ALTERED BY SCHEME DATED 15TH JULY 1905
Charitable objects
THE MAINTENANCE OF EXHIBITIONS PAYABLE AT THE SCHOOL OR INSTITUTION AT WHICH IT IS HELD AND TO BE AWARDED TO BOYS AND GIRLS WHO HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN THREE YEARS AT ANY TIME BEEN IN ATTENDANCE AT A PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF AYLESFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window