Financial history JAMES TILDEN'S FOUNDATION

Charity number: 307595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £450 £430 £450 £425 £450
Total expenditure £550 £0 £350 £0 £1.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A