SIR JOHN WILLIAMS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 307613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide support to Elham CoE Primary School and provide further education grants to students living within parish of Elham

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £10,435
Total expenditure: £9,700

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 January 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SIR JOHN WILLIAMS CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV Jane Weeks Chair 01 February 2016
None on record
Robert Knight Trustee 26 October 2022
None on record
Kevin Lamb Trustee 27 September 2021
None on record
Graham Earnest-Jones Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Peter Swain Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
CLLR SUSAN CAREY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.76k £8.90k £9.05k £9.31k £10.44k
Total expenditure £8.40k £8.15k £8.75k £9.40k £9.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 Fairfield
Elham
Canterbury
CT4 6UT
Phone:
01303840440
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available