Financial history REVEREND ROBERT GUNSLEY AYERST'S

Charity number: 307617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £214 £214 £219 £220 £223
Total expenditure £214 £214 £219 £220 £223
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A