Financial history THE LIGHTHOUSE CHAPEL INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1110619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £1.97m £2.01m £1.21m £1.17m £1.25m
Total expenditure £1.72m £2.12m £1.25m £1.40m £1.24m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.87m £1.92m £1.14m £1.06m £1.13m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £100.94k £94.35k £69.13k £111.07k £118.47k
Income - Other £163 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.72m £2.04m £1.17m £18.15k £136.96k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £1.38m £1.10m
Expenditure - Governance £861.52k £948.51k £620.71k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £855.73k £1.10m £545.34k £18.15k £136.96k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £78.13k £85.92k £0 £0