ANTIDOTE PROJECTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Antidote works with schools and children's services to help shape learning environments that offer young people the best possible opportunity to achieve and make a positive contribution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 June 1997: Standard registration
- 15 December 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ANTIDOTE:MAKING CHANGE POSSIBLE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.50k | £133.99k | £149.08k | £142.00k | £188.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.54k | £155.29k | £184.87k | £180.14k | £173.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 27 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 27 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 23 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 23 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 22 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 22 January 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10TH JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION AND RESEARCH (INCLUDING THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH) IN PSYCHOLOGY, SOCIOLOGY, ECONOMICS AND OTHER RELATED SUBJECTS IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MULTI-DISCIPLINARY STUDY OF THE CONSEQUENCES OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CHANGE; (B) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO THEIR SOCIAL AND EMOTIONAL DEVELOPMENT SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window