RACE ON THE AGENDA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Race on the Agenda (ROTA) is one of Britain's leading social policy think-tanks focusing on issues that affect Black, Asian and minority ethnic (BAME) communities. Originally set up in 1984, ROTA aims to increase the capacity of BAME organisations and strengthen the voice of BAME communities through increased civic engagement and participation in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 October 1997: Standard registration
- ROTA (Working name)
- ROTA RACE ON THE AGENDA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALI HASSAN AHMED | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Ariel Breaux | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
FEVZI HUSSEIN | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE DALEY | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Bakari Ukuu | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kadra Abdinasir | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr TELE AMULUDUN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GIFFORD SUTHERLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LORRAINE DONGO | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.79k | £333.03k | £235.57k | £159.25k | £269.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £221.43k | £228.83k | £254.13k | £185.98k | £151.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £129.46k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 AUGUST 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF RACIAL DISCRIMINATION AND TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY, HUMAN RIGHTS AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT GROUPS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Race on the Agenda
The Resource Centre
356 Holloway Road
London
N7 6PA
- Phone:
- 02076974093
- Email:
- rota@rota.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window