DESCENDANTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Descendants work primarily but not exclusively with children and young people age 4-18 of African and Caribbean descent,their parents and carers. Descendants meets weekly online Fridays 6-8p.m, term times. We runs educational, history,cultural, arts project Descendants We run mentor session, Holiday projects. We run Parent support group. We run an annual Achievements awards event every July.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,500 from 1 government contract(s) and £5,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 April 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Denise Charles Ms | Chair | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christal Douglas Ms | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chantel Noel-Morris Mrs | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy James | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Amara | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Collette Noel | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET NOEL | Trustee | 11 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE BERESFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CELESTINA UZOKA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.00k | £36.86k | £61.48k | £51.49k | £14.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.40k | £15.32k | £39.17k | £31.17k | £41.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £5.00k | £35.25k | £5.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 March 2025 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/01/2004 AS AMENDED ON 21/03/2005 AS AMENDED ON 06/01/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') ARE PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE GREATER LONDON BOROUGHS OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM, EALING, BRENT, HILLINGDON, HOUNSLOW PARTICULARLY THOSE RESIDENTS WHO ARE OF AFRICAN AND AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN DESCENT: A. TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES PARTICULARLY IN AFRICAN AND AFRICAN CARIBBEAN HISTORY. B. TO PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY BY DEVELOPING, STRENGTHENING AND PROMOTING BETTER RELATIONS BETWEEN THOSE OF AFRICAN AND AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN DESCENT AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY; AND BY PROMOTING BETTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN ALL MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY, LOCAL AND CENTRAL GOVERNMENT BODIES AND OTHER INSTITUTIONS. C. THE PROMOTION OF GOOD RACE RELATIONS, ENDEAVOURING TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION ON GROUNDS OF RACE AND ENCOURAGING EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit A
Munster Court
Bollo Bridge Road
LONDON
Community Centre
room 3
- Phone:
- 07745889521
- Email:
- descendantscharity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window