The Hanoon Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hanoon Foundation, previously known as FQMS, raises funds and organises support for many aspects of medical education in the different medical schools in Palestine
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Somerset
- Southampton City
- Throughout London
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
Governance
- 07 August 1997: Standard registration
- AL-QUDS FOUNDATION FOR MEDICAL SCHOOLS IN PALESTINE (Working name)
- F Q M S (Working name)
- FQMS (Working name)
- AL QUDS FOUNDATION FOR MEDICAL SCHOOLS IN PALESTINE (Previous name)
- FOUNDATION FOR AL-QUDS UNIVERSITY MEDICAL SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR AHMED MASSOUD MD | Chair |
|
||||||
Amy Doust | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Farah Abdulhadi | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alessio Sancetta | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ANDREW NIVEN | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yasmin Tabbakh | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Electra Simon | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Naseer Chia | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anjum Taban Misbahuddin | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Awwad Awwad | Trustee | 09 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rawya Charif | Trustee | 13 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Khaled Dawas | Trustee | 09 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr LINA NASHEF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £358.68k | £417.62k | £474.90k | £250.96k | £339.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £388.68k | £336.98k | £327.70k | £251.65k | £387.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.11k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD JULY 1997 as amended on 22 Nov 2021 as amended on 19 Oct 2021 as amended on 25 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
The advancement of education of the public in the field of medicine including oral medicine and dentistry and in particular but not so as to limit the generality of the foregoing: - (a) maintaining medical schools at Al-Quds University, Al Najah University, The Islamic University of Gaza and Al Azhar University, Gaza (the “Medical Schools”) for the training and qualification of the students of medicine at both Undergraduate and Postgraduate level (b) providing scholarships, grants, bursaries, chairs of learning lectureships and accommodation for students of medicine to enable them to further their education at the Medical Schools (c) the promotion of research into medical science at the Medical Schools and the publication of the useful results of such research (d) the provision and maintenance of a medical library and laboratories at the Medical Schools (e) providing continuing education and refresher courses for medical practitioners, nurses and allied professions run from the Medical Schools. (f) to advise on the setting and maintenance of medical educational standards at an internationally recognised level
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
86-90 Paul Street
London
EC2A 4NE
- Phone:
- 07575884536
- Email:
- admin@fqms.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window