Financial history HARMONIOUS LIVING

Charity number: 1065653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £8.40k £9.02k £8.76k £7.97k £177
Total expenditure £5.07k £4.76k £20.24k £16.78k £10.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A