Financial history HAYES OLD CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL

Charity number: 307714
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £60.40k £61.46k £58.99k £59.24k £37.73k
Total expenditure £43.68k £49.35k £68.62k £46.55k £123.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k