Charity overview THE HAROLD WYATT SCHOLARSHIP
Charity number: 528344-1
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL PROVED 22 OCTOBER 1948 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JANUARY 1965 AND SCHEME DATED 24 AUGUST 1973.
Charitable objects
A SCHOLARSHIP OR PRIZE TO BE AWARDED BY THE SENATE EACH YEAR TO A STUDENT IN THE SCHOOL OF LAW WHO QUALIFIES TO PROCEED TO PART I OF THE DEGREE OF BACHELOR OF LAWS OF WHO HAS SATISFACTORILY COMPLETED THE PART I EXAMINIATION OF THE DEGREE OF BACHELOR OF ARTS WITH HONOURS IN LAW AND WHO DECLARES HIS INTENTION TO PRACTISE AS A SOLICITOR AND WHI IS ADJUDGED TO BE THE BEST STUDENT OF THE YEAR WHO FULFILS THESE CONDITIONS AND SUCH OTHER CONDITIONS AS THE SENATE FROM TIME TO TIME THINKS FIT TO MAKE. PROVIDED THAT IN THE SELECTION OF THE AWARD HOLDER PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN, OTHER THINGS BEING EQUAL AMONGST CANDIDATES, OTHERWISE ELIGABLE AS AFORESAID, TO SUCH OF THEM (IF ANY) WHO ARE NORMALLY RESIDENT IN THE CITY OR COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 14 June 1966: Standard registration
- 31 January 1996: Removed (Excepted charity)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.