Accounts and annual returns NATIONAL PET MONTH

Charity number: 1114880
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 September 2020 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 26 September 2019 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required