Financial history NATIONAL PET MONTH

Charity number: 1114880
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £254 £25.00k £5.15k £5.00k £213
Total expenditure £4.69k £16.81k £13.38k £6.09k £1.64k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A