Financial history MERKAZ HATORAH VEHACHINUCH LIMITED

Charity number: 1062572
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2008 30/06/2009 30/06/2010 30/06/2011 30/06/2012
Total gross income £17.13k £24.81k £15.06k £4.72k £5.10k
Total expenditure £18.29k £27.24k £13.74k £5.37k £3.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A