GODDENS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants are made to school leavers, under the age of 21 years, to help them continue their education. Preference is given to apprenticeships. Applicants must have lived in the parishes of either Snodland or Birling, in Kent, for a reasonable period of time (usually taken as 5 years).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Kent
Governance
- 20 December 1962: Standard registration
- EDWARD GODDEN - OTHERWISE GODWYN (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW BALFOUR | Chair | 25 November 2002 |
|
|
||||
ANN HAYES | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JO CRITTEL | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Wallis | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA MURPHY | Trustee | 14 June 2000 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Hayes | Trustee | 16 November 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.68k | £1.64k | £1.67k | £1.72k | £1.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £2.90k | £1.27k | £2.00k | £1.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 November 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 November 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 December 2021 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 8TH FEBRUARY 1661, AS VARIED BY SCHEMES DATED 28TH JULY 1891 AND 10TH OCTOBER 1924
Charitable objects
APPRENCTICING POOR CHILDREN AND SUBJECT THERETO, ASSISTING PERSONS BY OUTFITS, INSTRUCTION FEES, TRAVELLING EXPENSES AND OTHER MEANS FOR THEIR ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF SNODLAND AND BIRLING
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Dowling Close
Snodland
ME6 5PF
- Phone:
- 01634 242720
- Email:
- j.hayes741@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window