BEST'S GIFT

Charity number: 307748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

SUPPORT FOR YOUNG PEOPLE

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £227
Total expenditure: £313

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Bromley
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 May 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JONATHAN JAMES HANSLIP WARD Chair 17 October 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, WEST WICKHAM
Received: On time
AMBER CRISIS PREGNANCY CARE
Received: On time
CONEY HALL TRUST
Received: On time
Felicity Mason Trustee 18 October 2022
None on record
Jacqueline Ann Barter Trustee 24 April 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, WEST WICKHAM
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £211 £216 £220 £226 £227
Total expenditure £236 £163 £183 £0 £313
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
30 Coney Hill Road
West Wickham
BR4 9BX
Phone:
07470 641588
Website:

No information available