Financial history UK FEDERATION OF CHINESE SCHOOLS

Charity number: 1061197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £48.34k £32.58k £25.00k £24.61k £30.00k
Total expenditure £44.08k £15.26k £23.00k £26.89k £7.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A