Accounts and annual returns THE A R PAULEY MEMORIAL PRIZE IN CONNECTION WITH DARTFORD TECHNICAL HIGH SCHOOL FOR BOYS

Charity number: 307806
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2004 21 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required