CHILDREN'S HOMES IN INDIA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Publicising the needs of children's homes in India and raising financial support for them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
Governance
- 14 November 2005: Standard registration
- CHIT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Howard Leslie Mathers CBE | Chair |
|
||||||
Kimberly Richard Matthews | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Clare Matthews | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daphne Browne | Trustee | 13 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Jean Gillman | Trustee | 03 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev MARY RAI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE MARY STANTON-SARINGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr KALWANT RAI | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.38k | £127.02k | £95.76k | £79.28k | £103.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.44k | £108.08k | £78.32k | £95.29k | £124.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 29 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; IN PARTICULAR, AMONGST CHILDREN IN INDIA, BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF CHILDREN'S HOMES AND ASSOCIATED PROJECTS, EDUCATIONAL SERVICES AND MATERIALS, IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Ridgeway
Binton
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
CV37 9TN
- Phone:
- 07776168860
- Email:
- info@chitonline.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window