Governing document AFRICA SERVICES INTERNATIONAL
Charity number: 1062847

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/05/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/05/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/07/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION ACCORDING TO THE STATEMENT OF BELIEF IN PARAGRAPH 4 HEREOF AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN AFRICA AND ELSEWHERE .
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
OVERSEAS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.