THE ST PAUL'S PRIMARY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity Number: 1062536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of St Paul's School Trust is to apply such sum in whatever charitable ways that the Trustees consider appropriate to promote the wellbeing of St Paul's CE Primary School and the education and welfare of the pupils and staff at the school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £1,866

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 May 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Clare Cresswell Trustee 12 October 2022
None on record
Theresa Davis Trustee 12 October 2022
None on record
ROY STANSON Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Rev Daniel Paul Sandham Trustee 28 March 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S CHURCH, WINCHMORE HILL
Received: On time
ST PAUL'S WINCHMORE HILL TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £250 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £1.00k £1.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. PAULS C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
RINGWOOD WAY
LONDON
N21 2RA
Phone:
02083603137
Website:

No information available