Governing document MAIDSTONE GRAMMAR SCHOOLS
Charity number: 307837
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 18 FEBRUARY 1910 AS VARIED BY FURTHER SCHEMES OF 17 DECEMBER 1914, 31 JANUARY 1922, 22 JUNE 1928, 1 AUGUST 1934 AND ARTICLES OF GOVERNMENT OF 6 JUNE 1947
Charitable objects
1) A DAY OR BOARDING SCHOOL FOR BOYS 2) A DAY OR BOARDING SCHOOL FOR GIRLS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.