BARCLAYS OVERSEAS BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Alleviate poverty amongst former or retired employees of the Barclays Group, and their families, who were employees by the Barclays Group outside the United Kingdom and who now reside outside of their pension home base and who were granted a pension in a currency, other than British Sterling, which is affected by currency devaluation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 April 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Malawi
- New Zealand
- South Africa
Governance
- 13 May 1997: Standard registration
- 24 October 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 24 October 2018: Funds transferred to 313080 THE BANKERS BENEVOLENT FUND
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 03/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.65k | £102.82k | £105.87k | £80.00k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.66k | £93.82k | £82.95k | £79.97k | £85.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 April 2018 | 25 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 31 August 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 31 August 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 20 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 12 December 2016 | 42 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 30 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 07 October 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 25TH SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
THE TRUST FUND SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST AS TO BOTH CAPITAL AND INCOME TO BE APPLIED AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE, CREED, SEX OR COLOUR IN ANY MANNER DEEMED BY THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES TO BE CHARITABLE AMONGST THOSE FORMER OR RETIRED EMPLOYEES OF : (A) THE BANK; OR (B) OF ANY COMPANY WHICH IS ASSOCIATED WITH THE BANK BY BEING ITS SUBSIDIARY OR ITS HOLDING COMPANY OR THE SUBSIDIARY OF ANY HOLDING COMPANY, ALL SUCH TERMS AS DEFINED IN SECTION 736, COMPANIES ACT 1985; OR (C) SUCH OTHER COMPANIES OR BODIES AS THE BANK MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BY DEED OR DEEDS STATED TO BE SUPPLEMENTAL HERETO DETERMINE (SUBJECT TO SUCH CONDITIONS IF ANY AS THE BANK MAY BY SUCH DEED OR DEEDS PRESCRIBE) WHO EITHER WERE EMPLOYED BY THE BANK OR ANY SUCH COMPANY OR BODY OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM OR (WHEREVER THEY WERE EMPLOYED) ARE NOW RESIDENT OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM, AND THE SPOUSES OR FORMER SPOUSES, WIDOWS, WIDOWERS, CHILDREN (INCLUDING ILLEGITIMATE AND ADOPTED CHILDREN AND ANY PERSON WHO IS OR WAS TREATED BY SUCH FORMER OR RETIRED EMPLOYEE AS A CHILD OF THE FAMILY IN RELATION TO ANY MARRIAGE OF SUCH FORMER OR RETIRED EMPLOYEE) AND ANY OTHER PERSON WHO IS OR WAS MAINTAINED EITHER WHOLLY OR PARTLY BY ANY SUCH FORMER OR RETIRED EMPLOYEE OR BY HIS OR HER SPOUSE, FORMER SPOUSE, WIDOW OR ,WIDOWER.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window