THE WORLD EOD FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EOD IEDD training and operations. Reuse of armed conflict land
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambodia
- Laos
- Rwanda
- Thailand
Governance
- 11 June 1997: Standard registration
- 01 May 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £1 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 9 MAY 1997
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO IMPROVE PUBLIC SAFETY BY PROMOTING RESEARCH AND COLLECTING INFORMATION IN RESPECT OF TECHNIQUES FOR DISARMING DEVICES HAZARDOUS TO THE PUBLIC AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND INFORMATION-COLLECTING; (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN HAZARDOUS CLEARANCE OPERATIONS; AND (3) FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO HAVE BEEN INJURED BY EXPLOSIVE DEVICES BY PROVIDING ASSISTANCE WITH THE MEDICAL CARE AND TREATMENT OF ADVANCED SURGICAL AND REHABILITATION TECHNIQUES AND THE TREATMENT OF THOSE WHO HAVE SUFFERED SUCH INJURIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window