Accounts and annual returns SWAMINARAYAN WORLD ORGANISATION (UK)
Charity number: 1106277

Charity reporting is up to date (133 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 11 October 2024 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 July 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 12 July 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 June 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 19 June 2021 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window