Financial history TASHA FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1062805
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £685.60k £375.43k £88.24k £56.13k £56.68k
Total expenditure £690.09k £410.91k £169.77k £181.55k £117.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £24.99k £12.49k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Donations and legacies £2.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £680.74k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £1.70k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £1.16k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £647.49k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £11.37k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £31.23k N/A N/A N/A N/A