SOUTHAMPTON ROW TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1079020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote the advancement of education, the relief of poverty, the advancement of religion and such other purposes as are exclusively charitable under the laws of England and Wales.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 January 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CAF AMERICAN DONOR FUND (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carolyn Osteen Ward Trustee 10 June 2024
None on record
Meredith Niles Trustee 10 June 2024
None on record
Caroline Elizabeth Armes Rylatt Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
Mark Jonathan Greer Trustee 25 June 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £81.94m £84.01m £98.40m £106.59m £162.40m
Total expenditure £83.24m £76.21m £68.44m £88.79m £125.45m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £79.49m £83.40m £94.82m £104.12m £155.42m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.22m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.23m £605.00k £930.00k £2.47m £6.98m
Income - Other £0 £0 £2.65m £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £573.00k £739.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £83.24m £76.21m £68.44m £88.79m £125.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £34.00k £38.00k £60.00k £65.00k £61.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £82.74m £73.76m £67.83m £87.10m £123.48m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments £27.39m £32.33m £42.16m £30.98m £41.71m
Other assets £49.77m £56.19m £75.11m £104.17m £134.88m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £858.00k £180.00k £131.00k £1.45m £1.66m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 20 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 20 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 16 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 16 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 25 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 25 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHARITIES AID FOUNDATION
25 KINGS HILL AVENUE
KINGS HILL
WEST MALLING
ME19 4TA
Phone:
03000123088