Accounts and annual returns EKITI PARAPO IN UK

Charity number: 1065740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 September 2024 239 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 September 2024 604 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 September 2024 969 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 September 2024 1334 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required