Financial history EKITI PARAPO IN UK

Charity Number: 1065740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.47k £825 £2.64k £4.16k £3.57k
Total expenditure £2.10k £1.35k £700 £895 £6.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A