THE EDUCATION RENAISSANCE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To develop schools and support teachers who put spiritual values at the centre of education. The Trust operates worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 19 May 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brendan Gorman | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Ann Moss | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
KATHARINE LOUISE BODDY | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN KETTLE | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Therese Glover | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS REES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN MARSHALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.95k | £177.29k | £272.35k | £74.85k | £181.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £396.92k | £250.28k | £660.34k | £316.16k | £194.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 29TH APRIL 1997
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR (A) THE PROVISION AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF ANY SCHOOL FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THEN AGE OF 19 YEARS WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES SEEKS TO APPLY THE PRINCIPLES OF EDUCATION CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE ANNEXED HERETO AND (B) THE CREATION OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND BURSARIES AND PRIZES TO BE AWARDED TO PUPILS AT ANY SUCH SCHOOL (C) THE PUBLICATION OF MATERIALS TO BE USED AT ANY SUCH SCHOOL AND (D) THE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR THE TRAINING OF TEACHERS AT ANY SUCH SCHOOL IN SUCH MANNER AS THEY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 BEDFORD GARDENS
LONDON
W8 7ED
- Phone:
- 02077278611
- Email:
- admin@ert.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window