ASSOCIATION OF NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCHES IN THE BOROUGH OF BARNET (BARNET BOROUGHWATCH (BBW))
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the efficiency of the police and to promote good citizenship, enhance public safety and secure greater public participation in the prevention and solution of crime by facilitating an effective liason between the police, local authority and public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
Governance
- 04 June 1997: Standard registration
- 24 April 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- BARNET BOROUGHWATCH (Working name)
- ASSOCIATION OF NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCHES IN THE BOROUGH OF BARNET (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 27/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.18k | £65.73k | £70.69k | £220 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.15k | £64.88k | £68.84k | £45 | £5.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 27 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 27 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 27 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 27 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 27 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 27 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 27 December 2013 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 16 APRIL 1997, AS AMENDED ON 14 JUNE 2001 AND 19TH MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION AMONGST PERSONS WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY; AND B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
BARNET, GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window