NEW REVELATION PENTECOSTAL CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
advancement of christian religion and relieve of poverty in UK. Teaching, Educating, Building the Future
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 June 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 30 December 1997: Standard registration
- 29 May 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/06/2011 | 15/06/2012 | 15/06/2013 | 15/06/2014 | 15/06/2015 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 15 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 15 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 15 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 15 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 15 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 15 June 2015 | 13 May 2016 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 June 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 1ST OCTOBER 1997. SUPPLEMENTAL DEED MADE 28TH NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE U.K.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window