HARRINGTON AVIATION MUSEUM SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Society are to advance the education of the public by exhibitions, presentations and the establishment and maintenance of the Carpetbagger Aviation Museum at Harrington
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 22 April 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE BASSETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stephen John Davis | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Edward Nieszwic | Trustee | 29 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN LITTLEMORE | Trustee | 05 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Ian Hanson | Trustee | 05 July 2012 |
|
|||||
ROY TERENCE TEBBUTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRED WEST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.12k | £10.52k | £16.45k | £5.54k | £8.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.43k | £11.23k | £7.12k | £7.39k | £7.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 July 2024 | 272 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/02/1997 AS AMENDED ON 03/06/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY EXHIBITIONS, PRESENTATIONS, AND THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A MUSEUM FOR THE EXHIBITION AND PRESERVATION OF AERONAUTICAL AND MILITARY EQUIPMENT AND ARTIFACTS OF HISTORICAL AND TECHNICAL INTEREST, PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO THE 801ST/492ND BOMB GROUP OF THE USAAF AND WARTIME COVERT OPERATIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carpetbagger Aviation Museum
Sunnyvale Farm
Harrington
Northampton
NN6 9PF
- Phone:
- 01604686608
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window