SOUTHWARK DAY CENTRE FOR ASYLUM SEEKERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity runs three drop in centres in Southwark for asylum seekers and refugees. We offer a free hot meal, general advice, english classes, access to clothing and food parcels. Different cultural and leisure activities are offered. Help can be given to locate GP's, medical services, solicitors and specialist advice. Cr+¿che facilities are available as required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 18 September 1997: Standard registration
- 21 March 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 21 March 2013: Funds transferred to 1143912 SOUTHWARK DAY CENTRE FOR ASYLUM SEEKERS
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £183.13k | £186.71k | £173.37k | £203.50k | £169.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.35k | £196.27k | £192.55k | £197.51k | £184.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 18 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 18 January 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 19 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 21 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 27 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 27 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 31 OCTOBER
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY , THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND THE FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION FOR ASYLUM SEEKERS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window