Trustees THE WORDSWORTH TRUST
Charity number: 1066184
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROF DRUMMOND BONE | Chair | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Jonathan Paul Johnson | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Donna Chambers | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Anne Elizabeth Young | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Lisa Peter | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Timothy John Robertson | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Amy Elizabeth Concannon | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Paul John Davies | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||
PROFESSOR DAVID JOHN MCKITTERICK | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Professor Simon John Julian Bainbridge | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Anna Mairead Fleming | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Gesa Renate Blackmore | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
David Michael Heal | Trustee | 02 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Judith Helen Cooke | Trustee | 02 November 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.