Financial history MUSIC FOR CHANGE

Charity number: 1063706
Charity reporting is up to date (99 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £163.05k £166.08k £63.58k £101.13k £48.43k
Total expenditure £165.47k £134.15k £95.80k £113.80k £59.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £2.42k N/A
Income from government grants £500 £35.38k £27.31k £44.67k £10.00k