HORN OF AFRICA WOMEN'S AND CHILDREN'S ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To Provide advice and guidance on health, employment education, Housing, Interpreting and Welfare issues. HAWA runs classes for children and women of refugees families who have a low income. The classes will help these disadvantaged children achieve their goals. Majority of our users reside in Colindale, Burnt Oak, Edgware, Mill Hill and Hendon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 April 1999: Standard registration
- HAWA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
abshir mohamed | Chair | 05 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Aisha Mohamed | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abdihakim Mohamed | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
AYAN AHMED | Trustee | 06 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
OMAR MOHAMED ABDI | Trustee | 06 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.08k | £32.00k | £39.94k | £39.95k | £20.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.79k | £25.98k | £23.60k | £30.97k | £11.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.25k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 March 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 March 2023 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 February 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 15 AUGUST 1996.
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY AND DISTRESS OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN FROM THE HORN OF AFRICA WHO ARE LIVING IN THE BOROUGH OF BARNET AND NEIGHBORING BOROUGHS. 2. TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN FROM THE HORN OF AFRICA WHO, BECAUSE OF THEIR SOCIAL AND POLITICAL BACKGROUND, HAVE FALLEN BEHIND OTHER COMMUNITIES. THE CHARITY AIMS TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMS , SUCH AS TEACHING THE SOMALI LANGUAGE, LITERATURE, RELIGIOUS AND CULTURAL STUDIES. TO PROVIDE SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION FOR THE CHILDREN. 3. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF WOMEN FROM THE HORN OF AFRICA BY IDENTIFYING AND RESEARCHING THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS AND TO PROVIDE ADVICE AND SUPPORT ACCORDINGLY , PARTICULARLY WITH REFERENCE TO WOMEN'S CIRCUMCISION , PREVENTION OF DISEASES AND BIRTH CONTROL AND PRODUCING INFORMATION ON PRIMARY HEALTH CARE IN THE U.K. 4. TO RELIEVE ELDERLY AND DISABLED WOMEN AND DISABLED CHILDREN GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 The Concourse graham park
LONDON
NW9 5XB
- Phone:
- 07932093917
- Email:
- hawacharity96@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window