CLARINET AND SAXOPHONE EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity Number: 1062116
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Collects donations to fund the trust's educational activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2017
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £550
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
Registration history:
- 28 April 1997: Standard registration
- 09 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- CASET (Working name)
- CASS TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | 30/04/2016 | 30/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160 | £125 | £146 | £556 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.01k | £400 | £1.07k | £0 | £550 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | 25 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2016 | 26 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2015 | 04 April 2016 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2014 | 26 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 3RD APRIL 1997.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS, AND PARTICULARLY THE ART OF PLAYING THE CLARINET AND THE SAXOPHONE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NATIONAL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window