THE FLUTEWISE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Flutewise is an organisation for young flute players, which organises and runs a wide range of events, across the UK and abroad, produces relevant printed matter and has an active website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Croatia
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Slovenia
Governance
- 16 September 1998: Standard registration
- FLUTEWISE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LOUISE POWELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Joleigh Saunders | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH SAUNDERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN WATTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY ROBERT GOODWIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.58k | £1.41k | £228 | £43 | £643 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.10k | £2.83k | £1.46k | £1.72k | £4.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND MAY 1993 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 27TH AUGUST 1998.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST SHALL BE EDUCATIONAL AND IN PARTICULAR TO ENCOURAGE AND ENHANCE THE MUSICAL APPRECIATION AND EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE FLUTE AND SIMILAR INSTRUMENTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8-9 BEACONSFIELD ROAD
PORTSLADE
BRIGHTON
BN41 1XA
- Phone:
- 01273702367
- Email:
- hello@flutewise.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window