AGRICOLA CLUB MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aims of the Trust are: 1) to assist former members of Wye College who are in need, 2) to assist people who have taken a course at the Wye campus to undertake postgraduate studies, 3) to support education and research in agriculture, horticulture and the rural environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Kent
Governance
- 18 January 1963: Standard registration
- AUGMENTATION TO THE AGRICOLA CLUB WAR MEMORIAL FUND ICW WYE COLLEGE KENT (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher REYNOLDS | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PAUL WEBSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES PAUL COURSE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.18k | £17.51k | £15.28k | £14.13k | £15.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.92k | £25.86k | £23.84k | £28.88k | £21.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 June 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 23 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 APRIL 1950 AND A RESOLUTION MADE UNDER SECTION 74(2)(D) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
THE INCOME MAY BE APPLIED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE. PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO THE ORIGINAL OBJECTS AND BENEFICIARIES OF THE CHARITY (THAT IS: THE MAKING OF GRANTS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT (A) TO ASSIST A PERSON TO TAKE A COURSE OF INSTRUCTION AT THE COLLEGE (B) TO ASSIST STUDENTS AT THE COLLEGE TO UNDERTAKE POST GRADUATE WORK (C) TO ASSIST MEMBERS OR PAST MEMBERS OF THE COLLEGE IN NEED)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heathpatch Ltd
Dairy Farm Office
Dairy Road
Semer
IPSWICH
IP7 6RA
- Phone:
- 01449257210
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window