POPLAR HOUSING AND REGENERATION COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Poplar Housing and Regeneration Community Association (HARCA) is a Registered Provider landlord that owns and manages approximately 9,000 homes in Poplar and Bow, East London. It provides housing services to its residents and its focus is physical and community regeneration through building new homes, environmental works and a significant investment in community development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Total income:
£74,766,894
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £51.83m | |
Other trading activities | £3.58m | |
Investments | £7.04m | |
Other | £12.32m |
Total expenditure:
£45,759,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £42.51m | |
Other | £3.24m |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £412,646 from government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.25m | |
Charitable expenditure | £42.51m | |
Retained for future use | £29.01m |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 15 September 1997: Standard registration
- 14 March 2017: Funds received from 1154602 SETTING THE MILESTONE LIMITED
- 23 April 2018: Removed (Exempt charity)
- POPLAR HARCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.23m | £56.49m | £58.84m | £61.80m | £74.75m | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.89m | £55.78m | £50.03m | £55.94m | £60.24m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £145.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.75m | £368.75k | £412.65k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £729.00k | £907.00k | £1.11m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £711.00k | £348.00k | £415.00k | £4.62m | £3.58m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £43.93m | £45.35m | £45.15m | £47.37m | £51.83m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.16m | £1.07m | £1.17m | £496.00k | £7.04m | |
|
Income - Other | £4.70m | £8.81m | £10.99m | £9.32m | £12.32m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £47.31m | £55.63m | £49.88m | £52.15m | £42.51m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.58k | £12.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £90.00k | £50.00k | £63.00k | £86.00k | £67.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £714.00k | £806.00k | £555.00k | £134.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £2.05m | £0 | £0 | £3.76m | £3.24m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £220.97m | £234.56m | £238.41m | £3.33m | £3.41m | |
|
Long-term investments | £10.01m | £10.06m | £10.06m | £460.27m | £485.16m | |
|
Other assets | £38.10m | £42.62m | £48.79m | £42.65m | £51.44m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£4.18m | -£4.11m | -£6.75m | -£6.14m | -£6.95m | |
|
Total liabilities | £241.07m | £258.57m | £259.75m | £450.15m | £468.99m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 31 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 31 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 28 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 28 January 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/09/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/08/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/12/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/09/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 JUN 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 NOV 2015
Charitable objects
(1) TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THE BUSINESS OF: (A) PROVIDING HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; (B) PROVIDING FOR AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES OF SUCH PERSONS; (C) PROVIDING SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF IN ARRANGING OR CARRYING OUT WORKS OF IMPROVEMENT, REPAIR OR MAINTENANCE TO HOUSES OCCUPIED BY THEM, AND PROVIDING ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS. (2) THE PROVISION OF RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IN WHICH THE POPLAR HOUSING AND REGENERATION COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED ("THE ASSOCIATION") OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK AND NEIGHBOURING LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS. (3) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IN WHICH THE ASSOCIATION OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK AND NEIGHBOURING LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS. (4) THE PROMOTION AND CO-ORDINATION OF THE PHYSICAL, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC REGENERATION OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IN WHICH THE ASSOCIATION OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK AND NEIGHBOURING LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF SUCH AREAS. (5) SUPPORTING ANY CHARITABLE ORGANISATION CARRYING ON ACTIVITIES WITHIN THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IN WHICH THE ASSOCIATION OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK AND NEIGHBOURING LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window