Financial history TOURISM CONCERN

Charity number: 1064020
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £158.64k £97.04k £72.29k £85.88k £72.29k
Total expenditure £193.39k £104.70k £66.34k £77.23k £88.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0