EBONY HOUSING PROJECT
Charity number: 1062349
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout London
Governance
Registration history:
- 13 May 1997: Standard registration
- 28 September 2004: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND DECEMBER 1996, AND AMENDED 26TH APRIL 1997
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO RELIEVE POVERTY OF PERSONS IN LONDON, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING TO OBTAIN EMPLOYMENT IN THE HOUSING SECTOR.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
LONDON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window