THE LOST MUSICALS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Lost Musicals Charitable Trust researches and reconstructs the lesser known and rarely if ever performed theatre work of the major theatre writers of twentieth century musical theatre. Performances are often limited to only five and the actors taking part receive no fees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 April 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNE KAUFMAN SCHNEIDER | Trustee | 18 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT GARDINER | Trustee | 18 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE UNDERWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £483 | £483 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 4TH FEBRUARY 1997, AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTARY DEED MADE 25TH MARCH 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN MUSICAL THEATRE BY THE PROVISION AND DISSEMINATION OF RESEARCH INTO NEGLECTED TWENTIETH CENTURY AMERICAN MUSICALS OF HISTORICAL AND EDUCATIONAL VALUE AND THE PUBLIC PERFORMANCE OF SUCH MUSICALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
116 Eton Place
Eton College Road
LONDON
NW3 2DT
- Phone:
- 02078134682
- Email:
- imf@dircon.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window